This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 20:06:43 (UTC).

BOUDRAR, ANNIE TSANG VS BOUDRAR, ISMAIL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 BOUDRAR, ANNIE TSANG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOUDRAR, ISMAIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1992

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOUDRAR ANNIE TSANG

Respondent

BOUDRAR ISMAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHEN STEPHEN K

Respondent Attorney

CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

7/6/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

6/8/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution

6/8/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/8/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service of Summons

3/15/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons

2/24/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/24/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

2/24/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/24/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

2/24/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response to Dissolution ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH