Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 13:20:12 (UTC).

BOTHWELL, DANETTE VS BOTHWELL, STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 BOTHWELL, DANETTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOTHWELL, STEPHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VEASEY, GLENDA and BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0691

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VEASEY, GLENDA

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOTHWELL DANETTE

Respondent

BOTHWELL STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STENZEL ANH NGUYEN

Respondent Attorney

DEAN MICHELLE A.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

4/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - Income and Expense

2/26/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Motion to strike

2/26/2021: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Motion to strike

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/3/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Minute Order

3/11/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order - No Fee

3/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - No Fee

Proof of Service - of ELECTRONIC SERVICE

12/17/2020: Proof of Service - of ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice - of intent to seek Watts charges pursuant to in RE marriage of Watts 1985

12/17/2020: Notice - of intent to seek Watts charges pursuant to in RE marriage of Watts 1985

FCS-Blue Memo (FAM FCS 001)

12/16/2020: FCS-Blue Memo (FAM FCS 001)

Proof of Service - Mail

12/3/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet's atty :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

12/2/2020: Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet's atty :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

Notice - of Petitioner's Intent Not to Stipulate to Commissioner

11/23/2020: Notice - of Petitioner's Intent Not to Stipulate to Commissioner

Proof of Service - Mail

11/23/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

11/19/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

Declaration - Income and Expense

11/19/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/10/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Mail

9/10/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/23/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDissomaster Printout

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order - No Fee; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketReply (Declaration of Petitioner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (of ELECTRONIC SERVICE ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (by mailed FL-117 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STENZEL ANH NGUYEN