Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 00:01:59 (UTC).

BORIS SCHAAK VS JP ALLEN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 BORIS SCHAAK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JP ALLEN, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2451

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHAAK BORIS

Claimant and Not Classified By Court

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendants and Cross Defendants

THE BURBANK HOTEL LLC A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR A DELAWARE CORPORATION

JP ALLEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff

TK ELEVATOR CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANSELL ROBERT

Claimant Attorney

CHEBOULI FERIEL

Defendant Attorney

NELSON MARK P.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/16/2021: PI General Order

Cross-Complaint

5/7/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Lien

6/3/2021: Notice of Lien

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Boris Schaak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Non-Party); STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Boris Schaak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by TK Elevator Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TK Elevator Corporation Erroneously Sued As THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by TK Elevator Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by TK Elevator Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Boris Schaak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Boris Schaak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Boris Schaak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Boris Schaak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.P. Allen, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BURBANK HOTEL LLC A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; is a litigant

Latest cases where TK ELEVATOR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant