Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 00:22:40 (UTC).

BORGES, MELISSA VS BORGES, MARCUS

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 BORGES, MELISSA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BORGES, MARCUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1142

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BORGES MELISSA

Respondent

BORGES MARCUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NUTT SANDRA MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney (IN SANDRA M NUTT ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Notice (NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less