Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 15:46:19 (UTC).

BOOTS, CLIFFORD J. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 BOOTS, CLIFFORD J - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4219

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Not Classified By Court

BOOTS CLIFFORD J.

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Other

MAGEE CAROL BOOTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANAYA-SERNETT STEPHANIE LYNN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PRICE WILLIAM CECIL

 

Court Documents

Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care

4/19/2021: Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care

Doctor's Capacity Declaration - Capacity Declaration - Updated

2/16/2021: Doctor's Capacity Declaration - Capacity Declaration - Updated

Notice - Hearing

2/16/2021: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

2/25/2021: Minute Order

Order - Appointing Conservator

3/24/2021: Order - Appointing Conservator

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

3/30/2021: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

2/11/2021: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Petition For Fees

1/8/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Petition For Fees

Letters - Temporary

10/27/2020: Letters - Temporary

Order - Appointing Temporary Conservator - Person and Estate granted to 02/25/2021 @ 1:30 PM D-44

10/27/2020: Order - Appointing Temporary Conservator - Person and Estate granted to 02/25/2021 @ 1:30 PM D-44

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

10/27/2020: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Petition - Allowance of Fees

11/19/2020: Petition - Allowance of Fees

Citation - Citation with Proof of Service

8/14/2020: Citation - Citation with Proof of Service

Objection - Appoint Conservator

10/7/2020: Objection - Appoint Conservator

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Competing)

10/7/2020: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Competing)

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

6/3/2020: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketConservatorship Care Plan/Determination (Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care ); Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial) - Conservatorship; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketProbate Investigations Memo to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCitation; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE WILLIAM CECIL