Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 05:12:51 (UTC).

BONNIE PAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF MALIBU, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 BONNIE PAN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF MALIBU, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6205

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAN AN INDIVIDUAL BONNIE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

CITY OF MALIBU A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

SIROTENKO AN INDIVIDUAL IRINA

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CITY OF MALIBU A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WELLS GEOFFREY S.

WELLS GEOFFREY STUART ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

D'ORO FRANK J.

MAMIKONYAN ARTAK

STONE GENE STEPHEN

D'ORO FRANK JOSEPH JR

HURRELL THOMAS CHARLES ESQ.

STONE GENE STEPHEN ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STONE GENE STEPHEN

STONE GENE STEPHEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

6/11/2021: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION CITY'S OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MTN TO QUASH

6/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION CITY'S OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MTN TO QUASH

Opposition - OPPOSITION CITY'S OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MTN TO QUASH EMPLOYMENT RECORDS

6/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION CITY'S OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MTN TO QUASH EMPLOYMENT RECORDS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 06/24/2021

6/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 06/24/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMEN...) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMEN...) OF 06/29/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO QUASH

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO QUASH

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO QUASH

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO QUASH

Separate Statement

5/14/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Quash

5/14/2021: Motion to Quash

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

4/7/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

3/23/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/23/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Business Records Issued, Seeking Plaintiff's Mental Health Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoenas Seeking Plaintiff's Mental Health Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Hearing08/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ERRATA REGARDING CITY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR INSURANCE RECORDS); Filed by CITY OF MALIBU, a government entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Hearing Date on Motion to Quash Subpoenas Seeking Plaintiff's Mental Health Records); Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Hearing Date on Motion to Quash Subpoenas Seeking Plaintiff's Employment Records and Prior Insurance Records); Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Geoffrey Stuart Wells, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 2:59 PM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Case Reassignment to Departmen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Case Reassignment to Departmen...) of 06/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BONNIE PAN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF MALIBU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE GENE S. ESQ.