This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:53:41 (UTC).

BONNIE BLACK VS PLAZA PACOIMA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 BONNIE BLACK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PLAZA PACOIMA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE, LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6359

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BLACK BONNIE

Respondents and Defendants

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

PLAZA PACOIMA LLC

PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT INC

DOES 1 TO 200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

TOWNSLEY CHRISTOPHER B. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R. ESQ.

HARBER STEPHEN M. ESQ

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT, INC., AND PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/2/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT, INC., AND PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT, INC., AND PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC, FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/2/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT, INC., AND PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC, FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/1/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

6/23/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE

6/23/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS, PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT, INC. AND PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC'S, AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT ETC.

10/24/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINANTS, PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT, INC. AND PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC'S, AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT ETC.

Unknown

10/24/2017: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION INC. TO PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC

11/29/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION INC. TO PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC

STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

11/29/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION INC. TO PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC

11/29/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION INC. TO PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE, ETC

12/15/2017: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE, ETC

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

12/15/2017: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT, PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC, TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, INC.

12/18/2017: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT, PLAZA PACOIMA, LLC, TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, INC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Requests and Responses In Dispute); Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production Set Three); Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketSubpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deposition Appearance and Production of Documents at Deposition) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents (Set Three) to Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, Inc. and Award for Monetary Sanctions; and Proposed Order); Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Plaza Pacoima LLC (Defendant); Primestor Development, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bonnie Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6359    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

On October 11, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion to compel further responses to requests for production of documents. The hearing on the motion was set for November 8, 2019, which was also the trial date. On October 16, 2019, the Court denied Plaintiff’s ex parte application to continue the trial date or shorten time to hear the discovery motion because fact discovery was already closed and a noticed motion was necessary to reopen discovery. On October 28, 2019, the Court denied Defendant’s ex parte application to continue trial and continue the expert discovery cutoff date because expert discovery was closed and a noticed motion was necessary to reopen discovery. On October 31, 2019, the Court granted an ex parte application to continue the trial date from November 8, 2019 to January 10, 2020 because Plaintiff’s husband was having surgery. The Court did not continue any other dates and did not reopen discovery.

When Plaintiff filed the motion to compel on October 11, fact discovery was already closed, and the hearing date of November 8, the same as the trial date, was too late. Accordingly, the motion to compel is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMESTOR DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARBER STEPHEN M. ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL RAY