This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 08:40:58 (UTC).

BONGJA LEE, ET AL. VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 BONGJA LEE, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0987

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE BONGJA

LEE SHELLEY

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELARDE RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

TALLENT ERIN E

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/17/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

10/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/31/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

11/15/2022: Notice of Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/13/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Bongja Lee (Plaintiff); Shelley Lee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Bongja Lee (Plaintiff); Shelley Lee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bongja Lee (Plaintiff); Shelley Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 07/18/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bongja Lee (Plaintiff); Shelley Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bongja Lee (Plaintiff); Shelley Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bongja Lee (Plaintiff); Shelley Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TALLENT ERIN