This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 12:51:56 (UTC).

BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO. LTD VS DTIS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DTIS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN and MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1265

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO LTD.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DTIS LLC FKA SUNTREE LLC

DOES 1 - 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TYLER KIELER LAW OFFICEOF

KIELER TYLER TIMOTHY

Defendant Attorneys

FENNEMORE CRAIG PC (AMY ABDO)

ABDO AMY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/5/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order

7/5/2017: Order

Unknown

9/11/2017: Unknown

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/12/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

11/22/2017: Answer

Unknown

11/28/2017: Unknown

Answer

1/24/2018: Answer

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/20/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

2/21/2018: Unknown

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/4/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Unknown

6/22/2018: Unknown

Stipulation and Order

8/17/2018: Stipulation and Order

Order

10/16/2018: Order

Notice

11/27/2018: Notice

Notice of Ruling

11/27/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

12/4/2018: Unknown

Stipulation and Order

12/4/2018: Stipulation and Order

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Judgment (- Summary Judgment - Before Trial - 12/04/2018 entered for Cross-Complainant DTIS LLC FKA SUNTREE LLC against Cross-Defendant BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO LTD..); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (for Entry of Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice of all Remaining Claims); Filed by BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO LTD. (Plaintiff); DTIS LLC FKA SUNTREE LLC (Cross-Complainant); BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO LTD. (Cross-Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice (of Lodging Proposed and Stipulated form of Judgment); Filed by DTIS LLC FKA SUNTREE LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (of 10-16-18); Filed by DTIS LLC FKA SUNTREE LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion for Order to Deem as Admitted Defendant's First Set of Requets for Admission and to Compel Discovery Responses) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-09-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by BONANZA GROUP HOLDINGS CO LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Order (To show cause hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less