This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2019 at 00:57:57 (UTC).

BOLOUR ASSOC INC VS BUDGET ENTERPRISES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2017 BOLOUR ASSOC INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUDGET ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4625

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INCORPORATION

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SOLAR ART WINDOW FILM INCORPORATION

OLTMANS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

HAYESCO INCORPORATION

NEOGARD A DIVISION OF HEMPEL USA INC.

BUDGET ENTERPRISES INC. DBA SOLAR ART

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MAXPRO MANUFACTURING LLC

BUDGET ENTERPRISES INC. DBA SOLAR ART

MADICO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARIAIE JACK M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

WILCOX WENDY LEIGH

JULANDER DIRK ODELL ESQ.

BYRGE KIMBERLY ANNETTE

TATE MICHAEL ADAM

MCGUIRE RICHARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GOERLINGER JULIE A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order

2/4/2019: Order

Other -

2/4/2019: Other -

Amended Complaint

2/4/2019: Amended Complaint

Notice of Ruling

2/5/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/4/2019: Minute Order

Notice

1/28/2019: Notice

Answer

1/31/2019: Answer

Minute Order

1/16/2019: Minute Order

Notice

1/7/2019: Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/9/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (w/prejudice on x-comp. filed on 7/24/18 as to Solar Art and Maxpro Mfg.); Filed by MADICO, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MAXPRO MANUFACTURING, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MAXPRO MANUFACTURING, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (**On 1st amended complaint**); Filed by BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (On Maxpro and Madico's Motion for Good faith settlement); Filed by BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Good Faith Settlement. (cf 1/15/19)) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INCORPORATION (Plaintiff); BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING AFTER INTIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND OF SETTING OF AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FOR FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOLOUR ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLTMANS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOERLINGER, JULIE A