This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 02:50:18 (UTC).

BOLIVAR, RUTH KEIBEL VS SORGER, JASON

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 BOLIVAR, RUTH KEIBEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SORGER, JASON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILCOX, WENDY L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1423

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILCOX, WENDY L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOLIVAR RUTH KEIBEL

Respondent

SORGER JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CABRERA CRISTAL LISA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

2/9/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/9/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

2/9/2022: Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

Notice - Confirmation of Registration of Out of State Order

3/3/2022: Notice - Confirmation of Registration of Out of State Order

Mail - Returned Mail - - FW-003

2/28/2022: Mail - Returned Mail - - FW-003

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

2/10/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

Notice - Registration of Out of State Custody/Support Order

2/9/2022: Notice - Registration of Out of State Custody/Support Order

Minute Order

7/26/2022: Minute Order

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

6/15/2022: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

Registration of Out-of-State Custody Order - Registration of Out-of-State Custody Order

2/9/2022: Registration of Out-of-State Custody Order - Registration of Out-of-State Custody Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 81, Wilcox, Wendy L., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Consolidated into Other Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice - Confirmation of Registration of Out of State Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMail - Returned Mail (- FW-003 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketRegistration of Out-of-State Custody Order (Registration of Out-of-State Custody Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice - Registration of Out of State Custody/Support Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less