This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 10:52:45 (UTC).

BOLANOS, JOSE VS BOLANOS, ELEONOR

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 BOLANOS, JOSE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOLANOS, ELEONOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1086

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOLANOS JOSE

Claimants

CA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM CALSTRS

Respondent

BOLANOS ELEONOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HOLMES ROBERT KEITH

Respondent Attorney

HOHNE KRISTINA LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/28/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Request - Trial Setting - Request - Trial Setting (Requests)

11/17/2022: Request - Trial Setting - Request - Trial Setting (Requests)

Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan - Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan

10/27/2022: Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan - Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan

Stipulation and Order

10/20/2022: Stipulation and Order

Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - $20.00 (Orders)

10/20/2022: Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - $20.00 (Orders)

Notice - Limited Scope Representation - Notice - Limited Scope Representation (Notices)

10/13/2022: Notice - Limited Scope Representation - Notice - Limited Scope Representation (Notices)

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service)

10/4/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service)

RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - $60.00 (Comment)

10/4/2022: RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - $60.00 (Comment)

Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System

10/4/2022: Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

10/4/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System

10/4/2022: Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System

Joinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) - Joinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System

10/4/2022: Joinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) - Joinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney (Comment)

9/30/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney (Comment)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

8/17/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Notice - Limited Scope Representation - Notice - Limited Scope Representation (Notices)

7/18/2022: Notice - Limited Scope Representation - Notice - Limited Scope Representation (Notices)

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service)

7/18/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

7/18/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

6/29/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketRequest - Trial Setting (Request - Trial Setting (Requests) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketJoinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan ); Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation (Notice - Limited Scope Representation (Notices) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketJoinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) (Joinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketJoinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Spousal Support (RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - $60.00 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketJoinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Joinder)-California State Teachers' Retirement System ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation (Notice - Limited Scope Representation (Notices) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons (Summons) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLMES ROBERT K.