This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 03:38:16 (UTC).

BOEWRELL LENOIR ET AL VS STAPCLE CENTER AND LAKERS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 BOEWRELL LENOIR filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against STAPCLE CENTER AND LAKERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7791

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MORGAN LENO 2 AND 2

LENOIR BOEWRELL

Defendants and Respondents

LAKER'S ALL OCCUPANTS ARE KOBE BRYANT

STAPCLE CENTER

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT-LIMITED JURIS.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

1/5/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

1/9/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/29/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/3/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

12/20/2017: SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

12/20/2017: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Minute Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 309; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Minute Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 309; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Minute Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Boewrell Lenoir (Plaintiff); Morgan Leno 2 and 2 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

UD-100

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address):

FOR COURT USE ONLY

Rere e U oo & 637 Conr 24 Shecer TELEPHONENO: QoY - Lbo=3176 raxno. (optionaly: Lfi. ) CA qoon FILED E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional): Superior Court of Califormg ATTORNEY FOR (Name): County of Los Argeles SUPERIOR COURT OF‘CALIF RNIAl COE\NW OF STunely AosK 2 02017 STREET ADDRESS: tsee . " MAILING ADDRESS: DEC

CITY AND ZIP CODE: & A J (A 012 BRANCHNAME: (A Nl Dbk PLAINTIFF: Boews ™\ Lene /No«abm Leno 2and Z

St e Officer/Cler

| COMPLAINT — UNLAWFUL DETAINER*

[ ] compLAINT [C_] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amendment Number):

Jurisdiction (check all that apply):

[ ] ACTIONIS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [__| does not exceed $10,000 [_] exceeds $10,000 but does not exceed $25,000 ZI— ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIViL. CASE (amount demanded exceeds $25,000) ACTION iS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint (check all that apply): ' l:] from unlawful detainer to general unlimited civil (possession not in issue) [[] from untawful detainer to general limited civil (possession not in issue)

1. PLAINTIFF (name each): BQQM_,RH Lewnalyg

BC687791

from limited to unlimited E’“from unlimited to limited