This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:01:43 (UTC).

BOESCH LAW GROUP VS DAVID RANES

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 BOESCH LAW GROUP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against DAVID RANES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7411

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOESCH LAW GROUP

Defendant

RANES DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KSADZHIKYAN ANNIE

FELDMAN JASON K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment

8/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/9/2018: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Proof of Service by Mail

1/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

1/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

2/4/2019: Minute Order

Application for Publication

3/8/2019: Application for Publication

Substitution of Attorney

6/24/2019: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by BOESCH LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by BOESCH LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BOESCH LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by BOESCH LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BOESCH LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOESCH LAW GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KSADZHIKYAN ANNIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN JASON K.