Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 00:07:57 (UTC).

BODNER, BRENT R. VS BODNER, ADRIANA L.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 BODNER, BRENT R filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BODNER, ADRIANA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERTS, GARY D and PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1286

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERTS, GARY D

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BODNER BRENT R.

Respondent

BODNER ADRIANA L.

Other

NODAR RUDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BLUNT MERCEDES ELAINE

Respondent Attorney

LAFRANCE JONATHAN BAXTER

Other Attorney

STENZEL ANH NGUYEN

 

Court Documents

Declaration

2/24/2021: Declaration

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

2/24/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Substitution of Attorney

2/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service of Summons

3/4/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - of Avis Gibson;

3/9/2021: Declaration - of Avis Gibson;

Declaration - of unsupervised visitation provider (nonprofessional)

3/23/2021: Declaration - of unsupervised visitation provider (nonprofessional)

Proof of Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Service

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

2/16/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Ex Parte - Application

2/16/2021: Ex Parte - Application

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - First Amended

2/17/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - First Amended

Responsive Declaration - to Ex Parte

2/17/2021: Responsive Declaration - to Ex Parte

FCS-Blue Memo (FAM FCS 001)

2/22/2021: FCS-Blue Memo (FAM FCS 001)

Response - Domestic Violence

2/22/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Minute Order

2/25/2021: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/16/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

2/16/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

2/17/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/4/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of unsupervised visitation provider (nonprofessional) ); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 87, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order - No Fee; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketReply (Declaration of Adriana Bodner ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (WENDY ARGUETA ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OLGA SANTIESTEBAN ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPetition - Custody and Support of Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STENZEL ANH NGUYEN