This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 15:41:22 (UTC).

BOBBY HURTADO VS QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 BOBBY HURTADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3619

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

HURTADO BOBBY

WILKINS VONTINAE

QUINTERO GABRIELA

BROWN ARDISHA

PHILLIPS ALONZANIQUE

CARRILLO JOSEPH 20STLC00601

Defendants and Respondents

LIT.LA

DOES 1 TO 20

QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC

SHAMIM SEAN

PERRIN BRAD

QUIET CANYON MONTEBELLO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAFIR LAW OFFICES

SHY KENNETH RAY

TURLINGTON ALAN SHANE

STRICKLAND MICHELLE DENISE

LORENZ JENNA MARIE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LOUREIRO KARL R. ESQ.

LOUREIRO KARL

LOUREIRO KARL ROBERT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

9/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE

8/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE)

8/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE) OF 08/27/2021

8/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE) OF 08/27/2021

Motion to Consolidate

3/19/2021: Motion to Consolidate

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/24/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

10/7/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

11/23/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Related Case

11/23/2020: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial); Filed by Bobby Hurtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order); Filed by Quiet Cannon Montebello Inc. Erroneously Sued As Quiet Canyon Montebello Inc. (Defendant); Brad Perrin (Defendant); Sean Shamim (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alonzanique Phillips (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Bobby Hurtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service of Summons; Filed by Alonzanique Phillips (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by Alonzanique Phillips (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint (-Negligence; Premises Liability); Filed by Alonzanique Phillips (Plaintiff); Gabriela Quintero (Plaintiff); Vontinae Wilkins (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Quiet Cannon Montebello, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketQUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Bobby Hurtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bobby Hurtado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693619    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

   

Defendant Quiet Cannon Montebello Inc. db LIT.LA (“Defendant”) moves to consolidate the above-captioned case with the case entitled Alonzanique Phillips et al., v. Quiet Canyon Montebello, Inc. et. al. (Case No. 18STCV05041). “When actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay.” (Code Civ. Proc. § 1048, subd. (a).) The purpose of consolidation is to enhance trial court efficiency by avoiding unnecessary duplication of evidence and the danger of inconsistent adjudications. (See Todd-Stenberg v. Dalkon Shield Claimants Trust (1996) 48 Cal.App.4th 976, 978-979.)

The two actions arise from injuries allegedly sustained as a result of broken glass that fell from the upper level of a club on January 20, 2018. They will involve common questions of law and fact regarding liability. Accordingly, the motion to consolidate is GRANTED. Case No. BC693619 is consolidated with Case No. 18STCV05041, with Case No. BC693619 designated as the lead case. This order shall be filed in both cases but all subsequent papers shall be filed in the lead case only. The trial date of November 13, 2019 in BC693619 is vacated and the new trial date is May 12, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B, and the final status conference is April 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 4B.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LORENZ JENNA MARIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHY KENNETH RAY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLAND MICHELLE