This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 06:48:40 (UTC).

BOBBY GENTRY VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL- CULVER CITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 BOBBY GENTRY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL- CULVER CITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7650

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENTRY BOBBY

Defendants

PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL-CULVER CITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SISSON MICHAEL F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/31/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

5/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Hearing07/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bobby Gentry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bobby Gentry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bobby Gentry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bobby Gentry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SISSON MICHAEL FITZPATRIC