This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 15:24:10 (UTC).

BOAZ WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 BOAZ WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3433

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER AN INDIVIDUAL BOAZ

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF COMPTON A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

DOE AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

SENTER AN INDIVIDUAL ELUITH

TUBBS AN INDIVIDUAL LAWRENCE GILBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

METRI JOHN N.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2025
  • Hearing04/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • Hearing10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BOAZ WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BOAZ WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BOAZ WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF COMPTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John N. Metri