This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2020 at 20:15:54 (UTC).

BO DO KO USA INC. VS AMMEZZ II

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 BO DO KO USA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMMEZZ II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BO DO KO USA INC.

Defendants

AMMEZZ II

AMMEXX II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/9/2019: Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/9/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/9/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Statement

6/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/6/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PLAINTIFF BO DO KO USA, INC.'S MO...) OF 10/22/2019

10/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PLAINTIFF BO DO KO USA, INC.'S MO...) OF 10/22/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PLAINTIFF BO DO KO USA, INC.'S MO...)

10/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PLAINTIFF BO DO KO USA, INC.'S MO...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTON TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTON TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/1/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

9/25/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL, ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT AMMEXXII, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; MEMORANDUM OF P

7/17/2019: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL, ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT AMMEXXII, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; MEMORANDUM OF P

Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT ON STIPULATION

1/7/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT ON STIPULATION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketJudgment (- Stipulated Judgment - Before Trial - 01/07/2020 entered for Plaintiff BO DO KO USA INC. against Defendant AMMEXX II, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketJudgment (BY COURT ON STIPULATION); Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement (and enter judgment against defendant Ammesxx II (664.6)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement (and enter judgment against defendant Ammesxx II (664.6)) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Plaintiff Bo Do Ko USA, Inc.'s Mo...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Plaintiff Bo Do Ko USA, Inc.'s Mo...) of 10/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement (and enter judgment against defendant Ammesxx II (664.6)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUED MOTON TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT); Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BO DO KO USA INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less