This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 10:55:41 (UTC).

BO-D-BRO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, L.P., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 BO-D-BRO, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, L P , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6995

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BO-D-BRO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

FULL STAR PROPERTIES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEIFEN MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

PARK CAROLINE M.

POTTER TREVOR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

12/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 12/10/2021

12/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 12/10/2021

Notice of Related Case

9/16/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

6/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docketat 11:35 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 12/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Shangri-La Construction, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Full Star Properties, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Shangri-La Construction, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Full Star Properties, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Recordation of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)); Filed by Bo-D-Bro, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Bo-D-Bro, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Bo-D-Bro, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bo-D-Bro, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bo-D-Bro, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bo-D-Bro, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FULL STAR PROPERTIES LLC; AC CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BO-D-BRO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant