This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 03:26:49 (UTC).

BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA VS DAVID ERIC MARTIN

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID ERIC MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and PATRICK T. MEYERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6656

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

PATRICK T. MEYERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA A UTAH

Defendants

MARTIN FONTAY E. SR. AN INDIVIDUAL

MARTIN DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

MARTIN DAVID ERIC

MARTIN DAVID E.

MARTIN FONTAY ESTAVEN SR

MARTIN FONTAY SR

MARTIN SR. AN INDIVIDUAL FONTAY E. AKA FONTAY ESTAVEN MARTIN SR. AKA FONTAY E. MARTIN SR.

MARTIN DAVID

MARTIN FONTAY

MARTIN AN INDIVIDUAL DAVID AKA DAVID E. MARTIN AKA DAVID MARTIN AKA DAVID ERIC MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CALEY & ASSOCIATES

CALEY ESQ. REBECCA ANNE

 

Court Documents

Unknown

10/23/2017: Unknown

Application

12/4/2017: Application

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

3/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

3/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/29/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Unknown

4/12/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

4/17/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

5/17/2018: Case Management Statement

Unknown

6/11/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

8/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/20/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Compel

12/20/2018: Motion to Compel

Declaration

12/28/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Order

3/14/2019: Order

Notice of Ruling

3/21/2019: Notice of Ruling

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Order/Ruling Granting Motion to Compel Defendant Fontay Martin, Sr.'s Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One)); Filed by BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA, a Utah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA, a Utah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA, a Utah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Order/Ruling Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Compel Defendant Fontay Martin, Sr.'s (in pro per) Responses to Form Interrogatories (set one); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department E, Patrick T. Meyers, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • Application - Misc (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESS. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA, a Utah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Application ; Filed by BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA, a Utah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Summons; Filed by BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA, a Utah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA, a Utah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW BANK OF NORTH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALEY REBECCA