Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 04:45:51 (UTC).

BMC WEST, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS 5050 PICO LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 BMC WEST, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 5050 PICO LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4080

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMC WEST LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

5050 PICO LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

PARKVIEW FINANCIAL FUND GP INC.

LAKHMNA GAGANDEEP

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APANIAN MILENE C.

Other Attorneys

APANIAN MILENE

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/8/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

2/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAILING ON NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

2/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAILING ON NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Commencement of Action); Filed by BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Mailing on Notice of Lis Pendens); Filed by BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BMC WEST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMC WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer APANIAN MILENE