This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 04:12:59 (UTC).

B&M CONTRACTORS, INC. VS SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 B M CONTRACTORS, INC filed an Other lawsuit against SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0539

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B&M CONTRACTORS INC.

Defendants

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION LP

444 W OCEAN LLC

NATIONWIDE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS

442 OCEAN APT OWNER LLC

FARMERS AND MERCHANTS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTROVE STEVEN M.

Defendant Attorneys

LEIGHT MICHAEL EDWARD

GUERRIERI CARL A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/7/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/07/2020

2/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/07/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/03/2020

2/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/03/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/13/2019: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

11/14/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

General Denial

10/31/2019: General Denial

Proof of Service - No Service

10/1/2019: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Farmers and Merchants Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 02/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Farmers and Merchants Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by B&M Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&M CONTRACTORS (ROE 1)...... is a litigant

Latest cases where 444 W OCEAN LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where 442 OCEAN APT OWNER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. is a litigant