This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 14:46:58 (UTC).

BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC VS DOROTHY CAKE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOROTHY CAKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0620

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS LLC

Defendants

CAKE DOROTHY

SAN PASQUAL FIDUCIARY TRUST COMPANY

THE CHARLES N. CAKE TRUST FBO DOROTHY CAKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERAVI KAVEH KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

9/3/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Request for Dismissal

9/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Blusky Restoration Contractors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Blusky Restoration Contractors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Blusky Restoration Contractors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Blusky Restoration Contractors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN PASQUAL FIDUCIARY TRUST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERAVI KAVEH KEVIN