This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 09:50:10 (UTC).

BLUE LOGAN VS 1999 SYCAMORE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 BLUE LOGAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against 1999 SYCAMORE, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6871

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOGAN BLUE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP LLC

1999 SYCAMORE LLC

YAMASHIRO

HOLLYWOOD HOTELS & APARTMENTS

1999 N. SYCAMORE AVENUE PARKING

CURBSTAND INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN MORRIS

Defendant Attorney

LAKE JAY B.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BERMAN SCHNEIDER STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

10/31/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

10/28/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, CROSS-COMPLAINTS PENDING

10/20/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, CROSS-COMPLAINTS PENDING

Notice of Settlement

9/2/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

8/1/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/18/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANTS COUNSEL

7/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANTS COUNSEL

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

8/18/2021: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARIELA 0. KELLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEA VE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST CURBST AND, INC.

8/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARIELA 0. KELLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEA VE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST CURBST AND, INC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

Notice of Ruling

9/30/2021: Notice of Ruling

Cross-Complaint

10/6/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - NFC scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Blue Logan on 05/15/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Blue Logan as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Blue Logan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: 1999 Sycamore, LLC (Defendant); Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC (Defendant); Hollywood Hotels & Apartments (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAddress for Stephanie Berman Schneider (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, et al. on 10/06/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, Yamashiro, and 1999 Sycamore, LLC as to Curbstand, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC (Cross-Complainant); 1999 Sycamore, LLC (Cross-Complainant); As to: Curbstand, Inc (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Curbstand, Inc on 12/22/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Curbstand, Inc as to Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, 1999 Sycamore, LLC, Hollywood Hotels & Apartments, Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, Yamashiro, and 1999 N. Sycamore Avenue Parking

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Curbstand, Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Blue Logan (Plaintiff); As to: 1999 Sycamore, LLC (Defendant); Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC (Defendant); Hollywood Hotels & Apartments (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Blue Logan (Plaintiff); As to: 1999 Sycamore, LLC (Defendant); Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC (Defendant); Hollywood Hotels & Apartments (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Blue Logan (Plaintiff); As to: 1999 Sycamore, LLC (Defendant); Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC (Defendant); Hollywood Hotels & Apartments (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 5 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b"

Case Number: *******6871 Hearing Date: September 24, 2021 Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

September 24, 2021

CASE NUMBER

*******6871

MOTION

Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint

MOVING PARTIES

Defendants 1999 Sycamore, LLC, Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, and Yamashiro

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Plaintiff Blue Logan (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendants 1999 Sycamore, LLC, Boulevard Nightlife Group, LLC, and Yamashiro (collectively, “Defendants”) based on injuries Plaintiff alleges he sustained when he tripped over a chain barrier across the driveway of a restaurant owned and operated by Yamashiro. Defendants contend that CurbStand, Inc. (“CurbStand”) provided the valet service for the restaurant on the night in question. Defendants assert a CurbStand employee put up the subject chain barrier. Defendants seek leave to file a cross-complaint against CurbStand. The motion is unopposed.

DISCUSSION

Per Code of Civil Procedure section 428.10, a party against whom a cause of action is asserted may file a cross-complaint to assert “[a]ny cause of action he has against a person alleged to be liable thereon, whether or not such person is already a party to the action, if the cause of action asserted in his cross-complaint (1) arises out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences as the cause brought against him or (2) asserts a claim, right, or interest in the property or controversy which is the subject of the cause brought against him.” (Code Civ. Proc., ;428.10, subd. (b).) A party must obtain leave of court to file a cross-complaint if the party does not file the cross-complaint at the same time as the answer. The court may grant leave to file a cross-complaint in the interests of justice at any time during the course of the action. (Code Civ. Proc., ;428.10, subd. (c).)

Defendants seek leave to assert claims for indemnity against CurbStand. “Undoubtedly, a claim for contribution or indemnity ‘arises out of’ the same transaction or occurrence as the plaintiff's claim.” (Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. v. Superior Court (1999) 69 Cal.App.4th 785, 799.) The Court concludes it is in the interests of justice to resolve all issues regarding causation of the underlying incident in this action.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Therefore, the Court grants Defendants’ motion for leave to file a cross-complaint pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 428.10, subdivision (b), and orders Defendants to file and serve the proposed cross-complaint within 20 days of the hearing on the motion.

Defendants shall provide notice of this order and file a proof of service of such.

"


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YAMASHIRO is a litigant

Latest cases where CURBSTAND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP LLC DBA PROJECT CLUB LA is a litigant

Latest cases where 1999 SYCAMORE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant