This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2020 at 06:55:31 (UTC).

BLIKIAN, LUCY RAFAELLA VS BLIKIAN, ARTHUR

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 BLIKIAN, LUCY RAFAELLA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BLIKIAN, ARTHUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1687

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLIKIAN LUCY RAFAELLA

Respondent

BLIKIAN ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

COZINE TESS MARIE

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/10/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

9/10/2019: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

9/10/2019: Notice - Case Assignment

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

9/10/2019: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/10/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

9/10/2019: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Proof of Service - Mail

9/16/2019: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

9/16/2019: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

9/18/2019: Proof of Service of Summons

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/20/2019: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

10/3/2019: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

12/4/2019: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

12/4/2019: Declaration - Default FL170

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

12/4/2019: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Judgment

12/24/2019: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

12/24/2019: Notice - Entry of Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COZINE TESS MARIE