This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 17:14:07 (UTC).

BLASE DILLINGHAM, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 BLASE DILLINGHAM filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5068

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

BLASE DILLINGHAM AS TRUSTEE OF THE DILLINGHAM FAMILY TRUST

DILLINGHAM BLASE

DILLINGHAM SUSAN

GETMANSHCHUK VADIM

JESSE FARRAN AND JASON FARRAN AS CO-ADMINISTRATORS OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD ERIC FARRAN

SUSAN DILLINGHAM AS TRUSTEE OF THE DILLINGHAM FAMILY TRUST

BEMA MARIANNE GAL FOR LLOYD BEMA

BEMA MARIANNE GAL TO HAROLD BEMA

BEMA MARIANNE GAL TO MORGAN DONNELLY

UZNIS CAILEEN GAL TO ANDREW UZNIS

UZNIS CAILEEN GAL TO JACOB UZNIS

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

BEMA MARIANNE

GETMANSHCHUK VADIM

UZNIS CAILEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANTZ JAMES P

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON ESQ JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (LLOYD BEMA)

12/10/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (LLOYD BEMA)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MORGAN DONNELLY)

12/10/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MORGAN DONNELLY)

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE (JCCP) SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE (JCCP) SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service by Mail - RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/10/2022

1/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/10/2022

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/11/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/11/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/11/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/11/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/11/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM REDACTED

1/11/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM REDACTED

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM REDACTED

1/11/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM REDACTED

Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

1/13/2022: Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JACOB UZNIS)

2/2/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JACOB UZNIS)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ((Lloyd Bema)); Filed by Lloyd Bema (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ((Nikita Getmanshchuk)); Filed by Nikita Getmanshchuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Add-on to JCCP Petition; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (_Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketPetition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) (Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Blase Dillingham (Plaintiff); Blase Dillingham as Trustee of the Dillingham Family Trust Dated October 18, 2019 (Plaintiff); Susan Dillingham (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ((Morgan Donnelly)); Filed by Marianne Bema, (GAL to Morgan Donnelly) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ((Harod Bema)); Filed by Marianne Bema, (GAL to Harold Bema) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ((Jacob Uznis)); Filed by Caileen Uznis, GAL to Andrew Uznis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Blase Dillingham (Plaintiff); Blase Dillingham as Trustee of the Dillingham Family Trust Dated October 18, 2019 (Plaintiff); Susan Dillingham (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ((Andrew Uznis)); Filed by Caileen Uznis, GAL to Andrew Uznis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON ESQ JOHN