This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2022 at 10:22:36 (UTC).

BLANCA PENATE VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 BLANCA PENATE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9036

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENATE BLANCA

Defendants

GOEDE MICHAEL

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID F.

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/7/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

9/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/7/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

11/8/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/8/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2024
  • Hearing09/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2024
  • Hearing03/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2024
  • Hearing02/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant); As to: Blanca Penate (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Blanca Penate (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Goede (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2022; Service Cost: 42.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Blanca Penate (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2022; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Blanca Penate (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant); Michael Goede (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Blanca Penate (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant); Michael Goede (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Blanca Penate (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant); Michael Goede (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID F.