This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 00:39:39 (UTC).

BLANCA JULIA ARAUJO VS JUDITH GALEANA CORIA

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 BLANCA JULIA ARAUJO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUDITH GALEANA CORIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4345

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARAUJO BLANCA JULIA

Defendant

CORIA JUDITH GALEANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOTHE DENNIS H.

Defendant Attorney

MOSKOVIAN ANY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/14/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/27/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

8/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

12/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 12/09/2020

Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (RE: 20STCV08578 (PENDING IN DEPT. 45) AND 20STCV14345)

10/20/2020: Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (RE: 20STCV08578 (PENDING IN DEPT. 45) AND 20STCV14345)

Answer

10/20/2020: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (ReNewly Related Case) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Blanca Julia Araujo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:51 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 12/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Judith Galeana Coria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((Re: 20STCV08578 (pending in Dept. 45) and 20STCV14345)); Filed by Judith Galeana Coria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Blanca Julia Araujo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Blanca Julia Araujo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Blanca Julia Araujo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Blanca Julia Araujo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOTHE DENNIS H.