*******0930
06/27/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Other Labor
Los Angeles, California
CURTIS A. KIN
ARMEN TAMZARIAN
CHINCHILLA BLANCA
ESPERER HOLDINGS INC.
PARTNERS PERSONNEL - MANAGEMENT RESOURCES LLC
PARTNERS PERSONNEL - MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC
LO JUSTIN
DIBA KASEY
4/7/2023: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
4/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPL...)
4/7/2023: Order - ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPL...) OF 04/07/2023
4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
4/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)
3/24/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
3/22/2023: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)
3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...) OF 03/16/2023
3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/16/2023
2/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
2/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/01/2023
2/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
1/19/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
1/19/2023: Notice of Related Case
Hearing04/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial
[-] Read LessHearing03/18/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference
[-] Read LessHearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52
[-] Read LessDocketStatus Conference Re: Limited Jurisdiction scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Preparation Order (Non-Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Trial Preparation Order (Non-Jury Trial): As To Parties:
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for Trial Preparation Order (Non-Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder Regarding Defendants' Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/05/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/05/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessCase Number: *******0930 Hearing Date: March 16, 2023 Dept: 52
Defendants Partners Personnel-Management Services, LLC, Partners Personnel-Management Resources, LLC, and Esperer Holdings, Inc.’s Demurrer to Complaint
Defendants Partners Personnel-Management Services, LLC, Partners Personnel-Management Resources, LLC, and Esperer Holdings, Inc. demur to all causes of action alleged in plaintiff Blanca Chinchilla’s complaint.
After the parties filed their briefs in support of and opposition to this demurrer, the Court of Appeal issued a new opinion that may be relevant: Rocha v. U-Haul Co. of California (2023) 88 Cal.App.5th 65.
The court will exercise its discretion to continue this hearing and allow further briefing on the following question: What effect, if any, does Rocha v. U-Haul Co. of California (2023) 88 Cal.App.5th 65 have on defendants’ demurrer?
Plaintiff may file a supplemental brief and defendants may jointly file a supplemental brief on this question no later than March 24, 2023. The briefs shall be no longer than five pages.
The court hereby continues the case management conference to March 31, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The court hereby continues the hearing on defendants’ demurrer to March 31, 2023, at 9:00 a.m.