This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2023 at 21:58:12 (UTC).

BLANCA CHINCHILLA VS PARTNERS PERSONNEL ? MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 BLANCA CHINCHILLA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0930

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHINCHILLA BLANCA

Defendants

ESPERER HOLDINGS INC.

PARTNERS PERSONNEL - MANAGEMENT RESOURCES LLC

PARTNERS PERSONNEL - MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LO JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

DIBA KASEY

 

Court Documents

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

4/7/2023: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPL...)

4/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPL...)

Order - ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/7/2023: Order - ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPL...) OF 04/07/2023

4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPL...) OF 04/07/2023

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

4/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

3/24/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/22/2023: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...) OF 03/16/2023

3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...) OF 03/16/2023

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/16/2023

3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/16/2023

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/01/2023

2/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/01/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

2/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/19/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

1/19/2023: Notice of Related Case

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2024
  • Hearing04/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Limited Jurisdiction scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order (Non-Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Trial Preparation Order (Non-Jury Trial): As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Trial Preparation Order (Non-Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketOrder Regarding Defendants' Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/05/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/05/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Blanca Chinchilla (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. A Delaware Corporation (Defendant); PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); ESPERER HOLDINGS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0930 Hearing Date: March 16, 2023 Dept: 52

Defendants Partners Personnel-Management Services, LLC, Partners Personnel-Management Resources, LLC, and Esperer Holdings, Inc.’s Demurrer to Complaint

Defendants Partners Personnel-Management Services, LLC, Partners Personnel-Management Resources, LLC, and Esperer Holdings, Inc. demur to all causes of action alleged in plaintiff Blanca Chinchilla’s complaint.

After the parties filed their briefs in support of and opposition to this demurrer, the Court of Appeal issued a new opinion that may be relevant: Rocha v. U-Haul Co. of California (2023) 88 Cal.App.5th 65.

The court will exercise its discretion to continue this hearing and allow further briefing on the following question: What effect, if any, does Rocha v. U-Haul Co. of California (2023) 88 Cal.App.5th 65 have on defendants’ demurrer?

Plaintiff may file a supplemental brief and defendants may jointly file a supplemental brief on this question no later than March 24, 2023. The briefs shall be no longer than five pages.

The court hereby continues the case management conference to March 31, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The court hereby continues the hearing on defendants’ demurrer to March 31, 2023, at 9:00 a.m.