This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 16:53:16 (UTC).

BLANCA C. ALVARADO VS ABM INDUSTRIES, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 BLANCA C ALVARADO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABM INDUSTRIES, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4935

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVARADO BLANCA C.

Defendants

ABM INDUSTRIES INC. A CORPORATION

ROSEMAN VILMA L.

WHEELS LT A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALABISE PATRICIA DENISE

RODRIGUEZ BARROS PAMELA P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/27/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2024
  • Hearing12/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • Hearing06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Blanca C. Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Blanca C. Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Blanca C. Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Blanca C. Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Blanca C. Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Blanca C. Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALABISE PATRICIA DENISE