Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 03:36:20 (UTC).

BLAKE WILLIAMS VS EVE BERG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 BLAKE WILLIAMS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EVE BERG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0034

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS BLAKE

Defendants

MEGEFF JOHN

CITY OF TORRANCE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

BERG EVE

TORRANCE POLICE DEPARTMENT A PUBLIC AGENCY

ATHAN MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OLDENDORPH JAMES EDWARD

Other Attorneys

GLAVE COREY

 

Court Documents

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/5/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF OLDENDORPH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

3/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF OLDENDORPH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

3/5/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF OLDENDORPH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE

3/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF OLDENDORPH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/19/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • Hearing05/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Hearing05/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Hearing04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by John Megeff (Defendant); Mark Athan (Defendant); City of Torrance, a Municipal Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Oldendorph in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike); Filed by John Megeff (Defendant); Mark Athan (Defendant); City of Torrance, a Municipal Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by John Megeff (Defendant); Mark Athan (Defendant); City of Torrance, a Municipal Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Oldendorph in Support of Defendant's Demurrer); Filed by John Megeff (Defendant); Mark Athan (Defendant); City of Torrance, a Municipal Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Blake Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Blake Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Blake Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRANCE POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLAVE COREY