This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 00:36:24 (UTC).

BLACKSTONE HAMILTON VS BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN, A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 BLACKSTONE HAMILTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN, A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3780

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMILTON BLACKSTONE

Defendants

QUEST MEDIA & SUPPLIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STRATEGIC ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION AKA CARE1ST PARTNER PLAN INC.

DIXON LEONARD

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN AKA CARE1ST PARTNER PLAN INC.

QUEST MEDIA & SUPPLIES INC.

STRATEGIC ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ROESER STEPHANIE ANNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

4/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

Notice of Settlement

4/21/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

3/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/8/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE A. ROESER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN'S DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE A. ROESER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN'S DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

3/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

4/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/9/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/25/2021

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/25/2021

Case Management Statement

2/11/2021: Case Management Statement

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BLACKSTONE HAMILTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUEST MEDIA & SUPPLIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION AKA CARE1ST PARTNER PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Anne Roeser