Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 04:56:33 (UTC).

BITTON, ESTER VS BITAN, ZION

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 BITTON, ESTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BITAN, ZION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARDSON, ANNE K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4261

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARDSON, ANNE K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BITTON ESTER

Respondent

BITAN ZION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHAHROUZ FRANCESCA MINTZ

Other Attorneys

GLASSER CYNTHIA BETH

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

2/19/2021: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Substitution of Attorney - out: Francesca M. Shahrouz

2/19/2021: Substitution of Attorney - out: Francesca M. Shahrouz

Judgment

2/19/2021: Judgment

Miscellaneous - Certification of Minor's counsel re hours expended pursuant to CA Family Code 3153(b)

11/19/2020: Miscellaneous - Certification of Minor's counsel re hours expended pursuant to CA Family Code 3153(b)

Proof of Service - electronic service of declaration of counsel for a child regarding qualifications, certification of minor's counsel, proof of electronic service

11/19/2020: Proof of Service - electronic service of declaration of counsel for a child regarding qualifications, certification of minor's counsel, proof of electronic service

Declaration - of counsel for a child regarding qualifications

11/19/2020: Declaration - of counsel for a child regarding qualifications

Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor - Cynthia Glasser, Esq.

11/12/2020: Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor - Cynthia Glasser, Esq.

Reply - Declaration Of Ester Bitton In Support Of Request For Order

11/4/2020: Reply - Declaration Of Ester Bitton In Support Of Request For Order

Responsive Declaration - to Request to Reschedule Hearing

11/5/2020: Responsive Declaration - to Request to Reschedule Hearing

Responsive Declaration

11/5/2020: Responsive Declaration

FCS-Mediation Memo

11/10/2020: FCS-Mediation Memo

Declaration - Declaration Of Rodi Vogel In Regard To Petitioner's Request For Oders Re: Child Custody, Child visitation, Spousal Support, Child Support, Property Control

10/16/2020: Declaration - Declaration Of Rodi Vogel In Regard To Petitioner's Request For Oders Re: Child Custody, Child visitation, Spousal Support, Child Support, Property Control

Declaration

10/16/2020: Declaration

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

7/1/2020: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Summons

5/15/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/15/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/15/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

5/20/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPACE - Declaration and Order Re: Fees (Claim No. D-558275 ); Filed by Minor's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPACE - Declaration and Order Re: Fees (Claim Serial No. D558270 $287.50 ); Filed by Minor's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 43, Richardson, Anne K., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 43, Richardson, Anne K., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (out: Francesca M. Shahrouz ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice - Lodging (of Exhibits for DVRO Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • DocketEligible for OnLine Dispute (Added to trigger Modria integration )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASSER CYNTHIA B.