Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 05:42:07 (UTC).

BITA MIRIAM AZIMI VS NATHALIE HASSANI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 BITA MIRIAM AZIMI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATHALIE HASSANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0874

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZIMI BITA MIRIAM

Defendants

KARLSEN ALLAN FREDDY

HASSANI NATHALIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAADIAN BOBBY

Defendant Attorney

FLORES ZOJEILA

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/9/2020: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/28/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/28/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

8/24/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/14/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Hearing01/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nathalie Hassani (Defendant); Allan Freddy Karlsen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bita Miriam Azimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bita Miriam Azimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Bita Miriam Azimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bita Miriam Azimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bita Miriam Azimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bita Miriam Azimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAADIAN BOBBY ESQ.