This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 19:50:29 (UTC).

BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA VS BEAUCHAMP DISTRIBUTING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BEAUCHAMP DISTRIBUTING COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT S. DRAPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0775

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT S. DRAPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEPULVEDA BIRIDIANA

Defendant

BEAUCHAMP DISTRIBUTING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARIAS JANETH

LEONG ANGELA

Defendant Attorney

LYNCH MARY E.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/29/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/22/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

6/20/2022: Answer

Answer

5/19/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

7/28/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78, Robert S. Draper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BEAUCHAMP DISTRIBUTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BEAUCHAMP DISTRIBUTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BEAUCHAMP DISTRIBUTING COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BIRIDIANA SEPULVEDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAUCHAMP DISTRIBUTING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARIAS JANETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEONG ANGELA