Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 21:02:55 (UTC).

BINGZE LI, ET AL. VS STEVEN HONGJIE ZHANG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 BINGZE LI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEVEN HONGJIE ZHANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8520

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SFO MERCHANDISE INC.

LI BINGZE

Defendants

ZHANG STEVEN HONGJIE

YANG XIAOLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONG RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

WING ROBERT KIMBALL

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

12/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

1/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

2/17/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO F...)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO F...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/09/2021

3/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/09/2021

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

12/22/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Request for Judicial Notice

12/22/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Case Management Statement

10/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/2/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT K WING IN SUPPORT OF MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO DEFENDANTS' FILING THEIR DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF''S COMPLAINT

8/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT K WING IN SUPPORT OF MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO DEFENDANTS' FILING THEIR DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF''S COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/19/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/15/2020: Complaint

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Hearing11/15/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Hearing07/28/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion for Leave to Amend Answer) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by STEVEN HONGJIE ZHANG (Defendant); XIAOLI YANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to extend time for filing of Amended Complaint); Filed by BINGZE LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Robert K Wing in Support of Meet and Confer Prior to Defendants' Filing Their Demurrer to Plaintiff''s Complaint); Filed by STEVEN HONGJIE ZHANG (Defendant); XIAOLI YANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by BINGZE LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by BINGZE LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BINGZE LI (Plaintiff); SFO MERCHANDISE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BINGZE LI (Plaintiff); SFO MERCHANDISE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BINGZE LI (Plaintiff); SFO MERCHANDISE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BINGZE LI (Plaintiff); SFO MERCHANDISE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WING ROBERT K. ESQ.