This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2022 at 12:55:08 (UTC).

BILLY RAY CLAY, BY AND THROUGH MOANIESHA PATTERSON, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, VS AFFINITY HEALTHCARE CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 BILLY RAY CLAY, BY AND THROUGH MOANIESHA PATTERSON, HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AFFINITY HEALTHCARE CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0530

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAY BY AND THROUGH MOANIESHA PATTERSON HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM BILLY RAY

Defendants

AFFINITY HEALTHCARE CENTER

ALTA HOSPITAL SYSTEM LLC

ALTA LOS ANGELES HOSPITALS INC.

DIGNITY HEALTH

LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER LP

PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL

ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER

ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKLEY ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

MCVAY DEAN H

TROTTER MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/4/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

11/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

11/2/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BILLY

9/30/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BILLY

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

9/21/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BILLY

9/21/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BILLY

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2024
  • Hearing09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Affinity Healthcare Center (Defendant); Paramount Meadows Nursing Center LP (Defendant); As to: Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAddress for Robert Makley (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Dignity Health dba St. Mary Medical Center Long Beach Erroneously Sued As St. Mary's Medical Center (Defendant); As to: Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, on 09/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, as to St. Mary's Medical Center Foundation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, (Plaintiff); As to: St. Mary's Medical Center Foundation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, (Plaintiff); As to: Affinity Healthcare Center (Defendant); Service Date: 10/05/2022; Service Cost: 116.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, (Plaintiff); As to: Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/05/2022; Service Cost: 65.70; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Billy: Status Date changed from 09/21/2022 to 09/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Billy Ray Clay, by and through Moaniesha Patterson, his Guardian Ad Litem, (Plaintiff); As to: Affinity Healthcare Center (Defendant); Paramount Meadows Nursing Center LP (Defendant); St. Mary's Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PARAMOUNT MEADOWS NURSING CENTER L.P. DBA AFFINITY HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC is a litigant