Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 03:57:11 (UTC).

BILL JOHNSON, ET AL., VS ROBINS KAPLAN, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 BILL JOHNSON, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBINS KAPLAN, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY L. NEWMAN and GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7769

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NANCY L. NEWMAN

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEIBEL JAMES

JOHNSON BILL

Defendants

WEG HOWARD

KAPLAN ROBINS

LELAND JENNIFER

ROVINS KAPLAN MILLER & CIRES LLP

GEIBELSON MICHAEL AN INDIVIDUAL

LOTUS MEDIA LLC

GEIBELSON MICHAEL AN

ENTERTAIN LOTUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LITTLE JAMES J.

STILLMAN PHILIP H.

RIBAKOFF DAVID Z.

Defendant Attorneys

SILBERFELD ROMAN

CASSELMAN DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

10/4/2017: Case Management Statement

Motion to Compel

7/2/2018: Motion to Compel

Request for Judicial Notice

7/2/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Substitution of Attorney

7/17/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Judicial Notice

8/1/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/1/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Substitution of Attorney

8/7/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Reply

8/7/2018: Reply

Substitution of Attorney

8/7/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Opposition

8/8/2018: Opposition

Reply

8/14/2018: Reply

Ex Parte Application

9/5/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

9/6/2018: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

2/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:31 AM in Department K; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (filed by Defendant, Robin Kaplan LP) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Status Conference (Re Consolidation of Related Cases) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (With prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action; *Each party bears its own fees & costs; Court reserves jurisdiction under CCP 664.6); Filed by BILL JOHNSON (Plaintiff); JAMES SEIBEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by ROBINS KAPLAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Application; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Ex-Parte Application (RE CONTINUING TRIAL DATE,CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES ANDADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION FORJUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Ex Parte Application Re Continuing Trial Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application (RE COTINUING TRIAL DATE, CONSOLIDATING RALATED CASES AND ADVANCING HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by ROBINS KAPLAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases (W/SC127743 DEPT. P ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN BY PARKER MILLS LLP ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by BILL JOHNSON (Plaintiff); JAMES SEIBEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. Casselman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILBERFELD ROMAN M. ESQ.