This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 01:23:32 (UTC).

BIG3 LLC ET AL VS AHMED AL-RUMAIHI ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 BIG3 LLC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against AHMED AL-RUMAIHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0897

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACKSON O'SHEA

KWATINETZ JEFF

BIG3 LLC

CUBE ICE

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CUBE ICE

Defendants

AL-HAMADI FAISAL

THANI SHEIKH ABDULLAH BIN MOHAMMED BIN

SABI AYMAN

AL-RIMAIHI AHMED

BAKER AKBAR AL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GERAGOS MARK J. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LOVRIEN CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

4/5/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/6/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DEFAMATION [CIV. CODE ? 44] 2. DEFAMATION PER SE [CIV. CODE ?46]; ETC.

4/6/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DEFAMATION [CIV. CODE ? 44] 2. DEFAMATION PER SE [CIV. CODE ?46]; ETC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/6/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT

4/5/2018: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

4/26/2018: NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Ahmed Al-Rimaihi (Defendant); Ayman Sabi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DEFAMATION [CIV. CODE 44] 2. DEFAMATION PER SE [CIV. CODE 46]; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Big3 LLC (Plaintiff); O'shea Jackson (Plaintiff); Ice Cube (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Big3 LLC (Plaintiff); O'shea Jackson (Plaintiff); Jeff Kwatinetz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

7) ORIGIN AL

arior Court of California Sugounty of Los Angeles

| GERAGOS & GERAGOS APR 05 2018

A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION icar/Clerk LAWYERS Sherr HIiSTORIC ENGINE CO. NO. 28 By Deputy . 644 SOUTH FIGUEROA STREET n Gomez LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90017-341 1 TeELEPHONE (213) 625-3900

FacsiMILE (213) 232-3255 GERAGOS@GERAGOS.COM

| MARK J. GERAGOS SBN 108325

| BEN J. MEISELAS SBN 277412

Attorneys for Plaintiff BIG3 BASKETBALL, LLC, O’'SHEA JACKSON AKA ICE CUBE, AND JEFF KWATINETZ

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES — CENTRAL DISTRICT

BIG3 LLC, a limited liability company; Case No. B C700 8 97 O’Shea Jackson a/k/a Ice Cube, an individual; and Jeff Kwatinetz, an COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: individual;

1. DEFAMATION [Civ. Code § 44]

Plaintiffs, 2. DEFAMATION PER SE [Civ. Code

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Defendants.

SUMMARY

Plaintiffs Big3 Basketball LLC, O’Shea Jackson a/k/a Ice Cube, and Jeff Kwatinetz bring this action against Defendants Ahmed Al-Rumaihi, Faisal Al-Hamadi, Ayman Sabi, and Sheikh Abdullah bin Mohammed bin Sau Al Thani as an individual and Chief Executive Officer of the Qatari Investment Authority (“Defendants”) for Defamation, Defamation Per Se, Trade Libel, and Intentional Interference with Contractual Relations.

The BIG3 was the brainchild of founders and Plaintiffs, Ice Cube and Mr. Kwatinetz

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERAGOS MARK J.