This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2021 at 20:34:57 (UTC).

BIERA, DANIEL T. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 BIERA, DANIEL T - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7441

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BIERA DIANA

BIERA ERNEST

Decedent

BIERA DANIEL T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDERSON MICHAEL DALE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

7/29/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

7/30/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Hearing09/09/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON MICHAEL DALE