This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2022 at 08:47:12 (UTC).

BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6473

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIOS AN INDIVIDUAL BIBIANA

Defendants

ASM GLOBAL UNKNOWN ENTITY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

THE ANCHUTZ CORPORATION UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

PELCH MANAL H.

THOMAS ALLEN LEE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/16/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/16/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/16/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-JURISDICTION AND INTENT

9/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-JURISDICTION AND INTENT

Answer

9/28/2022: Answer

Answer

10/10/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

10/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2024
  • Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2024
  • Hearing01/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL on 08/16/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL as to CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: The People of The State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation, erroneously named as California Department of Transportation, a public entity Erroneously Sued As CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: The People of The State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation, erroneously named as California Department of Transportation, a public entity Erroneously Sued As CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); As to: BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Non-Jurisdiction and Intent; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); As to: BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ASM GLOBAL, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); Service Date: 09/06/2022; Service Cost: 99.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: THE ANCHUTZ CORPORATION, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); Service Date: 09/02/2022; Service Cost: 99.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BIBIANA RIOS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less