This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2019 at 03:33:23 (UTC).

BIBI MUHAMMAD VS HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK INC.,

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 BIBI MUHAMMAD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7290

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUHAMMAD BIBI

Defendants

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS

TROJAN CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

TRINITY FIANACIAL SERVICES LLC

RESIDENTIAL ACCREDIT LOANS INC.

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK INC.

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

SMAE LLC

AURORA BANK FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GUERRA TRACY LAW OFFICES OF

SILVERSTEIN STEVEN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

5/21/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISM...)

5/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISM...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL

4/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISM...)

4/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISM...)

Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 3/12/19

3/12/2019: Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 3/12/19

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

3/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Notice of Ruling

3/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

2/5/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration - Declaration MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P.430.41

12/28/2018: Declaration - Declaration MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P.430.41

Declaration - Declaration MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P.430.41

12/28/2018: Declaration - Declaration MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P.430.41

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

7/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

7/20/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

Summons -

7/20/2018: Summons -

Order - Order re: hearing of 11/27/18

11/27/2018: Order - Order re: hearing of 11/27/18

Notice of Ruling -

12/4/2018: Notice of Ruling -

Proof of Service by Mail

1/2/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Order - Order RE: HEARING OF 1/08/19

1/8/2019: Order - Order RE: HEARING OF 1/08/19

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by SMAE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (as to why the case should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to appear on 2/8/2019) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: as to why the case should not be dism...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (as to why the case should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to appear on 2/8/2019) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: as to why the case should not be dism...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Hearing on OSC Re Dismissal); Filed by Steven David Silverstein (Attorney); SMAE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by SMAE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOrder (re: hearing of 3/12/19); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketAppl, Waiver of Court Fees & Costs; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESIDENTIAL ACCREDIT LOANS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK,INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TROJAN CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRINITY FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant