This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 02:11:44 (UTC).

BIANCA SEALS VS EMANATE HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 BIANCA SEALS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against EMANATE HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2257

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEALS BIANCA

Defendants

EMANATE HEALTH A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EMANATE HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUKYAN EDGAR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

11/1/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

11/2/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: FINAL STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

10/4/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: FINAL STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2021

10/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2021

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FINAL STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

10/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FINAL STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

8/30/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

8/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2021, A COPY OF L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

8/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2021, A COPY OF L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

Order - ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

7/29/2021: Order - ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

7/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/25/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Bianca Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Bianca Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 2:32 PM in Department 16; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER RE: FINAL STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING); Filed by Emanate Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (FINAL STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING); Filed by Emanate Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Bianca Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING); Filed by Emanate Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder (RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING); Filed by Emanate Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bianca Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bianca Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bianca Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bianca Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANUKYAN EDGAR