This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 05:44:47 (UTC).

DIANE BHALAWAN VS TONY TOUTONI

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 DIANE BHALAWAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against TONY TOUTONI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1252

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANE BHALAWAN

Defendant

TOUTONI TONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEISELAS BENJAMIN JARED

DAS DEV DEEP

Defendant Attorney

PIRNIA ARDY

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/31/2021: Answer

Complaint

10/27/2020: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF DIANE BHALAWAN AKA DEYANA MOUNIRA'S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

1/12/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF DIANE BHALAWAN AKA DEYANA MOUNIRA'S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Case Management Order

2/22/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

11/12/2021: Notice of Continuance

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

10/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 10/28/2021

10/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 10/28/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

8/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2021

8/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2021

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Bhalawan Diane (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Farzad Toutouni Erroneously Sued As Tony Toutoni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Bhalawan Diane (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Bhalawan Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Tony Toutoni (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/31/2020; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Bhalawan Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Farzad Toutouni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stuart M. Rice in Department 49 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bhalawan Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Tony Toutoni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bhalawan Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Tony Toutoni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bhalawan Diane (Plaintiff); As to: Tony Toutoni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAS DEV DEEP

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEISELAS BENJAMIN JARED