This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2019 at 02:40:07 (UTC).

BHAJNEET MALIK VS ELLIS CHOI

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 BHAJNEET MALIK filed an Other lawsuit against ELLIS CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6594

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MALIK BHAJNEET

KAUR NATASHA

Defendants

CHOI ELLIS

CHUN GEE SUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD C. IP & ASSOCIATES

MALIK BHUPINDER KAUR

VO MICHELLE NGOC

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

SLATER HERSEY & LIEBERMAN LLP

WALLIN MICHAEL ADAM

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL]

6/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

3/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY) OF 03/08/2019

3/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY) OF 03/08/2019

Notice of Settlement

3/7/2019: Notice of Settlement

Summons

5/5/2017: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued

5/5/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued

Answer

5/19/2017: Answer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

5/22/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Notice of Related Case

7/3/2017: Notice of Related Case

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

8/28/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

11/2/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00

11/15/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

12/4/2017: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-01-29 00:00:00

1/29/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-01-29 00:00:00

Order - Order Re Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Dates

11/28/2018: Order - Order Re Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Dates

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)

11/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery:)

10/23/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery:)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (reDismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal Pursuant to Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BHAJNEET MALIK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Request for Dismissal]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (reDismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (ReMediation and Discovery) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BHAJNEET MALIK (Plaintiff); NATASHA KAUR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by BHAJNEET MALIK (Plaintiff); NATASHA KAUR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer (-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ELLIS CHOI (Defendant); GEE SUN CHUN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less