Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 21:55:36 (UTC).

BG RESOLUTION PARTNERS IV-B, L.L.C., ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 BG RESOLUTION PARTNERS IV-B, L L C filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7812

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOKYO MARINE KILN LONDON ON BEHALF OF THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING POLICY BB012251L5188

AMTRUST 1206

CAMBERWELL GREEN LLC

IRONSHORE BERMUDA

IRONSHORE IDEMNITY INC

THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING POLICY HGB0133567

MCHA HOLDINGS LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF NEW YORK MARINE AND GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING POLICY PSLPL 130783

BERKLEY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY BRIT 2987

CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1919

CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

BG RESOLUTION PARTNERS III-B L.L.C.

DB INSURANCE COMPANY

DONGBU INSURANCE COMPANY

BRIT 2987

VICTOR O. SCHINNERER & COMPANY

WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYCON HOWARD D.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; HEARI...)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; HEARI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; ORDER...)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; ORDER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RECEIPT OF LESS REDACTED CAL FIRE ...)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RECEIPT OF LESS REDACTED CAL FIRE ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PR...)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

1/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFER...)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION

12/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/15/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • Hearing05/19/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Receipt of Less Redacted Cal Fire Report) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Receipt of Less Redacted Cal Fire ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (In Camera Transcripts) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (and Stay Discovery) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and Stay Discovery; Order...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference under Code of Civil Pr...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Further Status Confer...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order RE: Twenty-Third Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Submission of Twenty-Third Petition for Coordination); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BG Resolution Partners IV-B, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); BG Resolution Partners III-B, L.L.C., (Plaintiff); Berkley National Insurance Company Brit 2987 (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BG Resolution Partners IV-B, L.L.C. (Plaintiff); BG Resolution Partners III-B, L.L.C., (Plaintiff); Berkley National Insurance Company Brit 2987 (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIT 2987 is a litigant

Latest cases where THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS SUBSCRIBING POLICY HGB0133567 is a litigant

Latest cases where LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1919 is a litigant

Latest cases where Watford Specialy Insurance Company is a litigant