This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 15:54:38 (UTC).

BG CAPITAL, LLC VS AHMAD YAKUB

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 BG CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AHMAD YAKUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5590

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BG CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

YAKUB AHMAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHEPER J. SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

BOON WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

8/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/9/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT)

Case Management Order

12/5/2019: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/2/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/2/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

12/2/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Case Management Statement

11/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

11/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

11/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/18/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/7/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

10/17/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 24; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 24; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by BG Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BG Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 24; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 24; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Ahmad Yakub (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference (re Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BG Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ahmad Yakub (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ahmad Yakub (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ahmad Yakub (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ahmad Yakub (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BG Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BG Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BG Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BG CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOON WILLIAM