This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 22:57:39 (UTC).

BEVERLY TEKALA VS HEALTHNET OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 BEVERLY TEKALA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HEALTHNET OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7291

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEKALA BEVERLY

Defendants

CENTENE CORPORATION A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

HEALTHNET OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARR MIKE T.

Defendant Attorney

JASSY KARA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/28/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/28/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/11/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/26/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION)

11/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 06/07/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Alternative Dispute Resolution)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Alternative Dispute Resolution scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 11/29/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Alternative Dispute Resolution scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (6 day estimate) scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 05/26/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Beverly Tekala (Plaintiff); As to: Healthnet of California, Inc., a California corporation doing business in California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Beverly Tekala (Plaintiff); As to: Healthnet of California, Inc., a California corporation doing business in California (Defendant); Centene Corporation, a corporation doing business in California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Beverly Tekala (Plaintiff); As to: Healthnet of California, Inc., a California corporation doing business in California (Defendant); Centene Corporation, a corporation doing business in California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less